US HR271 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 26 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 60.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and supporting the designation of July 2021 as National Blueberry Month.
Title
Recognizing the importance of the blueberry industry to the United States and supporting the designation of July 2021 as National Blueberry Month.
Sponsors
Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Fred Upton [R-MI] | Rep. Jackie Walorski [R-IN] | Rep. Chellie Pingree [D-ME] |
Rep. Kat Cammack [R-FL] | Rep. Jimmy Panetta [D-CA] | Rep. Dan Newhouse [R-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | House | Placed on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 60. |
2021-12-20 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Agriculture. H. Rept. 117-221. |
2021-09-21 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-09-21 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-09-21 | House | Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research Discharged. |
2021-04-05 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research. |
2021-03-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2021-03-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR139 (Related) 2021-07-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 03/25/2021 CR S1833-1834)
SR722 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698)
SR722 (Related) 2022-07-26 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3688; text: CR S3698)