US SR710 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4117; text: 05/23/2024 CR S3892)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 23 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-06-17 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4117; text: 05/23/2024 CR S3892)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of May 29, 2024, as "Mental Health Awareness in Agriculture Day" to raise awareness around mental health in the agricultural industry and workforce and to continue to reduce stigma associated with mental illness.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of May 29, 2024, as "Mental Health Awareness in Agriculture Day" to raise awareness around mental health in the agricultural industry and workforce and to continue to reduce stigma associated with mental illness.
Sponsors
Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-06-17 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4117; text: 05/23/2024 CR S3892) |
2024-06-17 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |