US SR70 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868; text: 2/23/2021 CR S825-830)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 23 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868; text: 2/23/2021 CR S825-830)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2021 through September 30, 2021, October 1, 2021 through September 30, 2022, and October 1, 2022 through February 28, 2023.
Title
An original resolution authorizing expenditures by committees of the Senate for the periods March 1, 2021 through September 30, 2021, October 1, 2021 through September 30, 2022, and October 1, 2022 through February 28, 2023.
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-24 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S868; text: 2/23/2021 CR S825-830) |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 6. |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Original measure reported to Senate by Senator Klobuchar. Without written report. |
Same As/Similar To
SR48 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S710-711)
SR49 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S711-712)
SR50 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S712)
SR51 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S712-713)
SR52 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S713)
SR54 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S714)
SR55 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S714)
SR56 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S715)
SR58 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S743-744)
SR59 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S744)
SR60 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S744-745)
SR64 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S772)
SR65 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S772-773)
SR66 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S773)
SR69 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S774-775)
SR49 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S711-712)
SR50 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S712)
SR51 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S712-713)
SR52 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S713)
SR54 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S714)
SR55 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S714)
SR56 (Related) 2021-02-12 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S715)
SR58 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S743-744)
SR59 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S744)
SR60 (Related) 2021-02-13 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S744-745)
SR64 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S772)
SR65 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S772-773)
SR66 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S773)
SR69 (Related) 2021-02-22 - Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text: CR S774-775)