US SR690 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3097; text: CR S3080)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 22 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-22 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3097; text: CR S3080)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 8, 2022, as "Collector Car Appreciation Day" and recognizing that the collection and restoration of historic and classic cars is an important part of preserving the technological achievements and cultural heritage of the United States.
Title
A resolution designating July 8, 2022, as "Collector Car Appreciation Day" and recognizing that the collection and restoration of historic and classic cars is an important part of preserving the technological achievements and cultural heritage of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT] | Sen. Richard Burr [R-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-22 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3097; text: CR S3080) |
Same As/Similar To
HR491 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR292 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4796; text: CR S4785)
HR1201 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR292 (Related) 2021-06-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4796; text: CR S4785)
HR1201 (Related) 2022-06-23 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/690/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres690/BILLS-117sres690ats.pdf |