US SR679 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commemorating June 19, 2022, as "Juneteenth National Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States.
Title
A resolution commemorating June 19, 2022, as "Juneteenth National Independence Day" in recognition of June 19, 1865, the date on which news of the end of slavery reached the slaves in the Southwestern States.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-15 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974) |
Same As/Similar To
HR480 (Related) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
HR1182 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR269 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
HR1182 (Related) 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR269 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/679/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres679/BILLS-117sres679ats.pdf |