US HR1182 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-0)
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 16 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
Pending: House Oversight and Reform Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizing June 19, 2022, as this year's observance of the historical significance of Juneteenth Independence Day.
Title
Recognizing June 19, 2022, as this year's observance of the historical significance of Juneteenth Independence Day.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform. |
2022-06-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR679 (Related) 2022-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2961; text: CR S2974)
HR480 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR269 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
HR480 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.
SR269 (Related) 2021-06-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4539; text: CR S4548)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-resolution/1182/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hres1182/BILLS-117hres1182ih.pdf |