US SR675 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week beginning on October 14, 2018, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week". Designates the week beginning on October 14, 2018, as National Wildlife Refuge Week. Acknowledges the importance of national wildlife refuges for their recreational opportunities and contribution to local economies. Reaffirms the support of the Senate for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning on October 14, 2018, as "National Wildlife Refuge Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. John Kennedy [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-10-11 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822) |
Same As/Similar To
HR560 (Related) 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
HR1122 (Related) 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SR289 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368-6389)
HR1122 (Related) 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SR289 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368-6389)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/675/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres675/BILLS-115sres675is.pdf |