US HR560 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 39-4)
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 5 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-10-06 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Encouraging observance of National Wildlife Refuge Week with appropriate events and activities, and for other purposes. Encourages the observance of National Wildlife Refuge Week. Acknowledges the importance of national wildlife refuges for their recreational opportunities and contribution to local economies. Reaffirms support for wildlife conservation and the National Wildlife Refuge System.
Title
Encouraging observance of National Wildlife Refuge Week with appropriate events and activities, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-10-06 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-10-05 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-10-05 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR289 (Related) 2017-10-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6375; text of measure as introduced: CR S6368-6389)
HR1122 (Related) 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SR675 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
HR1122 (Related) 2018-10-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
SR675 (Related) 2018-10-11 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6821-6822)
Subjects
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Birds
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of the Interior
Economic development
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Birds
Commemorative events and holidays
Department of the Interior
Economic development
Endangered and threatened species
Hunting and fishing
Land use and conservation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/560/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres560/BILLS-115hres560ih.pdf |