US SR658 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-2)
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 07/27/2020 CR S4508-4509)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 27 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 07/27/2020 CR S4508-4509)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns antidemocratic practices with regard to the 2020 presidential election in Belarus, including the politically motivated arrest of opposition candidates and peaceful protestors. The resolution expresses solidarity with the people of Belarus and calls on Belarus to hold free and fair presidential elections.
Title
A resolution calling for a free, fair, and transparent presidential election in Belarus taking place on August 9, 2020, including the unimpeded participation of all presidential candidates.
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-05 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 07/27/2020 CR S4508-4509) |
2020-08-05 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5228) |
2020-07-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S4508-4509) |
Subjects
Belarus
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency
Detention of persons
Elections, voting, political campaign regulation
Europe
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
News media and reporting
Political parties and affiliation
Protest and dissent
Rule of law and government transparency