US SR638 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3278-3279; text: 5/17/2022 CR S2548-2549)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-07-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3278-3279; text: 5/17/2022 CR S2548-2549)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution commending the Government and people of the Republic of Moldova for their heroic efforts to support Ukrainian refugees fleeing President Putin's illegal war against Ukraine.
Title
A resolution commending the Government and people of the Republic of Moldova for their heroic efforts to support Ukrainian refugees fleeing President Putin's illegal war against Ukraine.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] |
Sen. Rob Portman [R-OH] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-07-13 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S3278-3279; text: 5/17/2022 CR S2548-2549) |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 413. |
2022-06-14 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2022-06-09 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment favorably. |
2022-05-17 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |