US SR635 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-3)
Status: Introduced on September 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7299-7300; text as passed Senate: CR S7300; text of measure as introduced: CR S7280)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 21 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-21 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7299-7300; text as passed Senate: CR S7300; text of measure as introduced: CR S7280)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Recognizes the goals and achievements of Hispanic-serving institutions across this country. Designates the week beginning September 19, 2010, as National Hispanic-Serving Institutions Week.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning September 19, 2010, as "National Hispanic-Serving Institutions Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. John Ensign [R-NV] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-21 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7299-7300; text as passed Senate: CR S7300; text of measure as introduced: CR S7280) |
Same As/Similar To
HR737 (Related) 2009-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR1611 (Related) 2010-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR269 (Related) 2009-09-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9487; text as passed Senate: CR S9487; text of measure as introduced: CR S9440)
HR1611 (Related) 2010-09-14 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR269 (Related) 2009-09-16 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S9487; text as passed Senate: CR S9487; text of measure as introduced: CR S9440)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-resolution/635/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sres635/BILLS-111sres635ats.pdf |