US SR61 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S957; text as passed Senate: CR S947)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 27 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S957; text as passed Senate: CR S947)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates March 1, 2013, as Read Across America Day. Honors Theodor Geisel (Dr. Seuss) for his success in encouraging children to discover the joy of reading. Honors the 16th anniversary of Read Across America Day. Encourages parents to read with their children for at least 30 minutes on Read Across America Day.
Title
A resolution designating March 1, 2013, as "Read Across America Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-27 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S957; text as passed Senate: CR S947) |
Same As/Similar To
HR92 (Related) 2013-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR367 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1252-1253; text as passed Senate: CR S1238)
HR495 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR367 (Related) 2014-02-27 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1252-1253; text as passed Senate: CR S1238)
HR495 (Related) 2014-02-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Art, artists, authorship
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
Books and print media
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
Language arts
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/61/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres61/BILLS-113sres61ats.pdf |