US SR595 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2446; text: CR S2444-2445)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 19 2024 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2024-03-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2446; text: CR S2444-2445)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing the contributions of AmeriCorps members and alumni and AmeriCorps Seniors volunteers in the lives of the people and communities of the United States.
Title
A resolution recognizing the contributions of AmeriCorps members and alumni and AmeriCorps Seniors volunteers in the lives of the people and communities of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-19 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2446; text: CR S2444-2445) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1075 (Same As) 2024-03-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR230 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR136 (Related) 2023-03-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1044; text: CR S1057-1058)
HR230 (Related) 2023-03-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR136 (Related) 2023-03-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1044; text: CR S1057-1058)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/595/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres595/BILLS-118sres595ats.pdf |