US SR558 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 28 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 30, 2018, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day". Designates July 30, 2018, as National Whistleblower Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution designating July 30, 2018, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-12 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. |
2018-07-12 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4955) |
2018-06-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4741-4742) |
Same As/Similar To
HR977 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR231 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/25/2017 CR S4195)
SR231 (Related) 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/25/2017 CR S4195)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics