US SR231 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on July 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/25/2017 CR S4195)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-08-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/25/2017 CR S4195)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating July 30, 2017, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day". Designates July 30, 2017, as National Whistleblower Appreciation Day.
Title
A resolution designating July 30, 2017, as "National Whistleblower Appreciation Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Claire McCaskill [D-MO] |
Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] | Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-08-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4695; text: 7/25/2017 CR S4195) |
2017-08-01 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2017-07-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4195) |
Same As/Similar To
HR977 (Related) 2018-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR558 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
SR558 (Related) 2018-07-12 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics
Employment discrimination and employee rights
Fraud offenses and financial crimes
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government ethics and transparency, public corruption
Government operations and politics