US SR549 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 34-20-2)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S489; text: CR S501)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-08 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S489; text: CR S501)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 17 through February 24, 2024, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA Organization in developing the next generation of globally conscious leaders who will change the world, and celebrating the 10th anniversary of the "Give the Gift of Blue" program, which has donated more than 17,000 of the iconic FFA blue jackets to FFA members in need.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of February 17 through February 24, 2024, as "National FFA Week", recognizing the important role of the National FFA Organization in developing the next generation of globally conscious leaders who will change the world, and celebrating the 10th anniversary of the "Give the Gift of Blue" program, which has donated more than 17,000 of the iconic FFA blue jackets to FFA members in need.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-08 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S489; text: CR S501) |
Same As/Similar To
HR147 (Related) 2023-03-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
HR1015 (Related) 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
SR69 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S431-432; text: CR S430-431)
HR1015 (Related) 2024-08-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Research, and Biotechnology.
SR69 (Related) 2023-02-15 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S431-432; text: CR S430-431)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/549/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres549/BILLS-118sres549ats.pdf |