US SR546 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6012-6013; text as passed Senate: CR S6012-6013; text of measure as introduced: CR S5992-5993)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-08-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6012-6013; text as passed Senate: CR S6012-6013; text of measure as introduced: CR S5992-5993)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week of September 10, 2012, as National Adult Education and Family Literacy Week. Encourages people across the United States to support programs to assist those in need of adult education, workforce skills, and family literacy programs. Recognizes the importance of such programs. Calls upon public, private, and non-profit entities to support increased access to adult education and family literacy programs to ensure a literate society.
Title
A resolution designating the week of September 10, 2012, as "National Adult Education and Family Literacy Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT] |
Sen. Jim Webb [D-VA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-02 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6012-6013; text as passed Senate: CR S6012-6013; text of measure as introduced: CR S5992-5993) |
Same As/Similar To
SR258 (Related) 2011-09-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5393; text as passed Senate: CR S5393; text of measure as introduced: CR S5389-5390)
HR385 (Related) 2011-08-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR756 (Related) 2012-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR385 (Related) 2011-08-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR756 (Related) 2012-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/senate-resolution/546/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/sres546/BILLS-112sres546ats.pdf |