US HR756 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-1)
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on August 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2012-08-02 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the designation of National Adult Education and Family Literacy Week. Encourages people across the United States to support programs to assist those in need of adult education and family literacy programs. Requests that the President issue a proclamation recognizing the importance of adult education and family literacy programs, calling upon the federal government, states, localities, schools, libraries, nonprofit organizations, community-based organizations, consumer advocates, institutions of higher education, labor unions, and businesses to support increased access to adult education and family literacy programs to ensure a literate society.
Title
Expressing support for designation of the week of September 10, 2012, as National Adult Education and Family Literacy Week.
Sponsors
Rep. Jared Polis [D-CO] | Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Michael Doyle [D-PA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Ruben Hinojosa [D-TX] | Rep. Rush Holt [D-NJ] | Rep. Dennis Kucinich [D-OH] | Rep. Rick Larsen [D-WA] |
Rep. Michael Michaud [D-ME] | Rep. James Moran [D-VA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] |
Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA] | Rep. C.A. Ruppersberger [D-MD] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] |
Rep. John Yarmuth [D-KY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-08-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
Same As/Similar To
HR385 (Related) 2011-08-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR546 (Related) 2012-08-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6012-6013; text as passed Senate: CR S6012-6013; text of measure as introduced: CR S5992-5993)
SR258 (Related) 2011-09-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5393; text as passed Senate: CR S5393; text of measure as introduced: CR S5389-5390)
SR546 (Related) 2012-08-02 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6012-6013; text as passed Senate: CR S6012-6013; text of measure as introduced: CR S5992-5993)
SR258 (Related) 2011-09-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5393; text as passed Senate: CR S5393; text of measure as introduced: CR S5389-5390)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-resolution/756/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hres756/BILLS-112hres756ih.pdf |