US SR515 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433-3434; text as passed Senate: CR S3433-3434; text of measure as introduced: CR S3409-3410)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 7 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-07 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433-3434; text as passed Senate: CR S3433-3434; text of measure as introduced: CR S3409-3410)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designates the week beginning May 2, 2010, as National Physical Education and Sport Week. Recognizes the central role of physical education and sports in creating healthy lifestyles for all children and youth. Encourages: (1) school districts to implement local wellness policies, as described in the Child Nutrition and WIC Reauthorization Act of 2004, that include ambitious goals for physical education, physical activity, and other activities addressing the childhood obesity epidemic and promoting child wellness; and (2) schools to offer physical education classes to students and work with community partners to provide opportunities and safe spaces for physical activities before and after school and during the summer months for all children and youth.
Title
A resolution designating the week beginning May 2, 2010, as "National Physical Education and Sport Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-07 | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3433-3434; text as passed Senate: CR S3433-3434; text of measure as introduced: CR S3409-3410) |
Same As/Similar To
HR503 (Related) 2009-06-09 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
SR133 (Related) 2009-05-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5246; text as passed Senate: CR S5246; text of measure as introduced: CR S5241-5242)
HR1373 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
SR133 (Related) 2009-05-06 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5246; text as passed Senate: CR S5246; text of measure as introduced: CR S5241-5242)
HR1373 (Related) 2010-06-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Healthy Families and Communities.
Subjects
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Elementary and secondary education
Nutrition and diet
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Sports and recreation
Commemorative events and holidays
Elementary and secondary education
Nutrition and diet
Physical fitness and lifestyle
Sports and recreation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/senate-resolution/515/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/sres515/BILLS-111sres515ats.pdf |