US SR503 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2080-2081; text: CR S2080-2081)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2080-2081; text: CR S2080-2081)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Government of the People's Republic of China should immediately guarantee the safety and freedom of tennis star Peng Shuai.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the Government of the People's Republic of China should immediately guarantee the safety and freedom of tennis star Peng Shuai.
Sponsors
Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] |
Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN] | Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] |
Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR] | Sen. Raphael Warnock [D-GA] | Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S2080-2081; text: CR S2080-2081) |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 323. |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2022-03-23 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S525) |
Same As/Similar To
HR837 (Related) 2021-12-08 - The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.