US SR500 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 02/01/2022 CR S445-446)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-02-03 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 02/01/2022 CR S445-446)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the observation of National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month during the period beginning on January 1, 2022, and ending on February 1, 2022, to raise awareness of, and opposition to, human trafficking and modern slavery.
Title
A resolution supporting the observation of National Trafficking and Modern Slavery Prevention Month during the period beginning on January 1, 2022, and ending on February 1, 2022, to raise awareness of, and opposition to, human trafficking and modern slavery.
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK] | Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] |
Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-03 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 02/01/2022 CR S445-446) |
2022-02-03 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S527) |
2022-02-01 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR893 (Related) 2022-11-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.