US SR478 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2018 - 25% progression
Action: 2018-04-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2330; text: CR S2329)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution designating the week of April 21, 2018, through April 29, 2018, as "National Park Week".

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution designating the week of April 21, 2018, through April 29, 2018, as "National Park Week".

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-04-19SenateSubmitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2330; text: CR S2329)

Same As/Similar To

SR117 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2352-2353; text: CR S2370)
HR266 (Related) 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback