US HR266 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 6 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the week of April 15, 2017, through April 23, 2017, as "National Park Week". Supports the designation of a National Park Week. Encourages the people of the United States and the world to visit U.S. national parks.
Title
Designating the week of April 15, 2017, through April 23, 2017, as "National Park Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Mia Love [R-UT] | Rep. Paul Gosar [R-AZ] | Rep. Chris Stewart [R-UT] | Rep. Jason Chaffetz [R-UT] |
Rep. Rob Bishop [R-UT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-04-06 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-04-06 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR117 (Related) 2017-04-05 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2352-2353; text: CR S2370)
SR478 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2330; text: CR S2329)
SR478 (Related) 2018-04-19 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2330; text: CR S2329)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/266/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres266/BILLS-115hres266ih.pdf |