US SR472 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S9754)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-21 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S9754)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution reaffirming the partnership between the United States and the Dominican Republic and advancing opportunities to deepen diplomatic, economic, and security cooperation between the two nations.
Title
A resolution reaffirming the partnership between the United States and the Dominican Republic and advancing opportunities to deepen diplomatic, economic, and security cooperation between the two nations.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-21 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text of amendment in the nature of a substitute: CR S9754) |
2022-12-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.6614 Amendment SA 6614 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | S.Amdt.6614 Amendment SA 6614 proposed by Senator Durbin for Senator Menendez. (consideration: CR S9754; text: CR S9754) In the nature of a substitute. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | The committee substitute withdrawn by Unanimous Consent. |
2022-12-21 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S9753-9755) |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 602. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Menendez with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2022-12-07 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with an amendment in the nature of a substitute favorably. |
2021-12-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S8964-8965) |
Same As/Similar To
HR1509 (Related) 2022-12-06 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.