US SR434 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S7465)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 28 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-10-28 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S7465)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating October 30, 2021, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Title
A resolution designating October 30, 2021, as a national day of remembrance for the workers of the nuclear weapons program of the United States.
Sponsors
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-28 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text: CR S7465) |
Same As/Similar To
SR438 (Related) 2022-02-15 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S722; text: 11/03/2021 CR S7723-7724)
SR785 (Related) 2022-12-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10099; text: 09/20/2022 CR S4864-4865)
SR785 (Related) 2022-12-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S10099; text: 09/20/2022 CR S4864-4865)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/senate-resolution/434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/sres434/BILLS-117sres434is.pdf |