US SR429 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on April 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4833)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 19 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-07-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4833)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the ideals of World Malaria Day, including the target of ending malaria deaths by 2015. Recognizes the importance of reducing malaria to improve child and maternal health, especially in sub-Saharan Africa. Commends the progress made toward reducing global malaria prevalence and deaths, particularly through the efforts of the President's Malaria Initiative and the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria. Welcomes ongoing public-private partnerships to develop more effective and affordable tools for malaria diagnosis, treatment, and vaccination. Recognizes the goals to combat malaria in the Tom Lantos and Henry J. Hyde United States Global Leadership Against HIV/AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria Reauthorization Act of 2008. Supports continued U.S. leadership and investment in efforts to combat malaria as a critical part of the President's Global Health Initiative. Encourages members of the international community to sustain and scale up their support for efforts to combat malaria.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of World Malaria Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Jeff Bingaman [D-NM] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Thad Cochran [R-MS] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-07-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4833) |
2012-07-10 | Senate | S.AMDT.2507 Amendment SA 2507 agreed to in Senate by Unanimous Consent. |
2012-07-10 | Senate | S.AMDT.2507 Amendment SA 2507 proposed by Senator Brown OH for Senator Wicker. (consideration: CR S4833; text: CR S4833)Of a perfecting nature. |
2012-07-10 | Senate | Measure laid before Senate by unanimous consent. (consideration: CR S4832-4833) |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 433. |
2012-06-20 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2012-06-19 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2012-04-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2553) |
Same As/Similar To
HCR49 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
SCR15 (Related) 2011-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SCR15 (Related) 2011-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
Subjects
Africa
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health