US HCR49 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-08-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the ideals of World Malaria Day, including the achievable target of ending malaria deaths by 2015. Recognizes the importance of reducing malaria to improve child and maternal health, especially in sub-Saharan Africa. Commends the progress made toward reducing global malaria deaths and prevalence, particularly through the efforts of the President's Malaria Initiative and the Global Fund to Fight AIDS, Tuberculosis, and Malaria. Supports continued U.S. leadership and investment in efforts to combat malaria as a critical part of the President's Global Health Initiative. Encourages members of the international community to sustain and scale up their support for efforts to combat malaria.
Title
Supporting the goals and ideals of World Malaria Day, and reaffirming United States leadership and support for efforts to combat malaria as a critical component of the President's Global Health Initiative.
Sponsors
Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Jeff Fortenberry [R-NE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-08-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Africa, Global Health, and Human Rights. |
2011-05-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs. |
Same As/Similar To
SCR15 (Same As) 2011-06-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Foreign Affairs.
SR429 (Related) 2012-07-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4833)
SR429 (Related) 2012-07-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and with a preamble by Voice Vote. (text: CR S4833)
Subjects
Africa
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health
Child health
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Foreign aid and international relief
Health programs administration and funding
Health promotion and preventive care
HIV/AIDS
Infectious and parasitic diseases
International affairs
Public-private cooperation
Women's health
World health
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-concurrent-resolution/49/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hconres49/BILLS-112hconres49ih.pdf |