US SR418 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 28-17-1)
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7006)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 7 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-19 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7006)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of October 3 through October 9, 2021, as "National 4-H Week".
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of October 3 through October 9, 2021, as "National 4-H Week".
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-19 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: 10/07/2021 CR S7006) |
2021-10-19 | Senate | Senate Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7079) |
2021-10-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry. |
Same As/Similar To
HR1411 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and Labor.
SR817 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052-6053; text: CR S5558)
SR817 (Related) 2022-09-29 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6052-6053; text: CR S5558)