US SR415 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on November 7 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-11-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 11/07/2019 S6482)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States Postal Service should issue a commemorative postage stamp series honoring women veterans of the Armed Forces and that the Citizens' Stamp Advisory Committee should recommend to the Postmaster General that such a stamp series be issued.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate that the United States Postal Service should issue a commemorative postage stamp series honoring women veterans of the Armed Forces and that the Citizens' Stamp Advisory Committee should recommend to the Postmaster General that such a stamp series be issued.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-11-14SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 11/07/2019 S6482)
2019-11-14SenateSenate Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6614)
2019-11-07SenateReferred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.

Same As/Similar To

HR579 (Related) 2019-09-24 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback