US SR414 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-1)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1127-1128; text as passed Senate: CR S1127-1128)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1127-1128; text as passed Senate: CR S1127-1128)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urges the U.S. government and the international community to provide resources to support the government of Haiti's leadership of international assistance efforts and to conduct a post-disaster needs assessment that will focus on: (1) social sector services; (2) population resettlement; (3) stable and democratic governance; (4) economic sustainability; and (5) public order and rule of law. Encourages the U.S. government and the international community to support the leadership of the government of Haiti and key nongovernmental and private sector Haitian stakeholders to create a national recovery and development strategy. Applauds the international community's response to the preliminary appeal for assistance. Encourages: (1) international financial institutions and international organizations to continue their engagement in support of critical economic and security priorities; and (2) the International Monetary Fund (IMF), the World Bank, and the Inter-American Development Bank to relieve Haiti of its external debt obligations and seek new resources without adding to Haiti's existing debt obligations. Urges the U.S. government to assign a single person to coordinate U.S. assistance to Haiti.
Title
A resolution expressing the sense of the Senate on the recovery, rehabilitation, and rebuilding of Haiti following the humanitarian crisis caused by the January 12, 2010, earthquake in Haiti.
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] |
Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Bill Nelson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-04 | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S1127-1128; text as passed Senate: CR S1127-1128) | |
2010-02-24 | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 275. | |
2010-02-24 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Kerry without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. | |
2010-02-24 | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. | |
2010-02-09 | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S539-540) |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Congressional tributes
Disaster relief and insurance
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Haiti
International affairs
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Congressional tributes
Disaster relief and insurance
Foreign aid and international relief
Foreign loans and debt
Haiti
International affairs
Latin America
Multilateral development programs
Natural disasters
Rule of law and government transparency
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status