US SR388 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-2)
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2063; text of committee substitute as amended: CR S2063)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 3 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-04-13 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2063; text of committee substitute as amended: CR S2063)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the goals of International Women's Day. Supports the goals of International Women's Day. Recognizes that the empowerment of women is linked to a country's potential to generate economic growth, sustainable democracy, and inclusive security. Recognizes individuals in the United States and around the world, including women human rights defenders and civil society leaders, who have worked to ensure that women are guaranteed equality and basic human rights. Reaffirms the commitment to: (1) end discrimination and violence against women and girls, and ensure their safety and welfare; (2) pursue policies that guarantee the basic human rights of women and girls worldwide; and (3) promote women's participation in every aspect of society and community. Supports sustainable global development that seeks to achieve gender equality.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals of International Women's Day.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Mark Kirk [R-IL] | Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-13 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2063; text of committee substitute as amended: CR S2063) |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 401. |
2016-03-16 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker with an amendment in the nature of a substitute and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2016-03-03 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S1282-1283) |
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
International affairs
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
Women's rights
Crimes against women
Economic development
Human rights
International affairs
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
Women's employment
Women's rights