US SR357 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-10-04 - Star Print ordered on the resolution.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution honoring Missourians who made the ultimate sacrifice in Afghanistan.
Title
A resolution honoring Missourians who made the ultimate sacrifice in Afghanistan.
Sponsors
Sen. Josh Hawley [R-MO] | Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-10-04 | Senate | Star Print ordered on the resolution. |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6630; text: 09/14/2021 CR S6503) |
2021-09-22 | Senate | Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-09-14 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HR638 (Same As) 2021-09-14 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
SR402 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6863; text: CR S6849)
SR402 (Related) 2021-09-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6863; text: CR S6849)