US SR355 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on December 7 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-08 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate. Limits Senate post-cloture consideration to: (1) eight hours for a nomination, except for the nomination of an individual to a position at level I of the Executive Schedule or to serve as a federal judge or justice appointed to hold office during good behavior; and (2) two hours for U.S. district court nominations. Requires consideration of such nominations to be equally divided in the usual form.
Title
A resolution improving procedures for the consideration of nominations in the Senate.
Sponsors
Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] | Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 400. |
2018-05-08 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Reported by Senator Blunt with amendments. Without written report. |
2018-04-25 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2017-12-19 | Senate | Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. |
2017-12-07 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Rules and Administration. (text of measure as introduced: CR S7934) |