US SR349 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4598)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 19 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4598)
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution supporting the designation of September 19, 2023, as "National Stillbirth Prevention Day", recognizing tens of thousands of American families that have endured a stillbirth, and seizing the opportunity to keep other families from experiencing the same tragedy.
Title
A resolution supporting the designation of September 19, 2023, as "National Stillbirth Prevention Day", recognizing tens of thousands of American families that have endured a stillbirth, and seizing the opportunity to keep other families from experiencing the same tragedy.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-19 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4598) |
Same As/Similar To
HR686 (Same As) 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
HR1474 (Related) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR832 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S6224)
HR1474 (Related) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR832 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S6224)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/senate-resolution/349/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/sres349/BILLS-118sres349is.pdf |