US HR686 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-09-15 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Health.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Health Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Supporting the designation of September 19, 2023, as "National Stillbirth Prevention Day", recognizing tens of thousands of American families that have endured a stillbirth, and seizing the opportunity to keep other families from experiencing the same tragedy.
Title
Supporting the designation of September 19, 2023, as "National Stillbirth Prevention Day", recognizing tens of thousands of American families that have endured a stillbirth, and seizing the opportunity to keep other families from experiencing the same tragedy.
Sponsors
Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Alma Adams [D-NC] | Rep. Wiley Nickel [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-15 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2023-09-14 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2023-09-14 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR349 (Same As) 2023-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S4598)
HR1474 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR832 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S6224)
HR1474 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce.
SR832 (Same As) 2024-09-19 - Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text: CR S6224)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/118th-congress/house-resolution/686/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/118/bills/hres686/BILLS-118hres686ih.pdf |