US SR347 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S450)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-02-01 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S450)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution honoring the memory and legacy of Anita Ashok Datar and condemning the terrorist attack in Bamako, Mali, on November 20, 2015. Condemns the terrorist attack in Bamako, Mali, on November 20, 2015. Honors the memory of Anita Ashok Datar, the U.S. citizen who was killed in the attack. Recognizes Anita Ashok Datar's commitment to international development and public health, including her work to connect low-income women to quality health services. Extends heartfelt condolences and prayers to: (1) Anita Ashok Datar's family, friends, and colleagues, and particularly to her son, Rohan; and (2) the individuals touched by her life or affected by her death, including the dedicated development professionals and volunteers that continue to engage in humanitarian and development efforts. Pledges to continue to work to counter violent extremism, including through education and health care, in the United States and abroad.
Title
A resolution honoring the memory and legacy of Anita Ashok Datar and condemning the terrorist attack in Bamako, Mali, on November 20, 2015.
Sponsors
Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ] | Sen. Barbara Mikulski [D-MD] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-02-01 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S450) |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 354. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2016-01-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text of measure as introduced: CR S134-135) |
Subjects
Africa
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Mali
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
World health
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Foreign aid and international relief
International affairs
Mali
Social work, volunteer service, charitable organizations
Terrorism
World health