US SR302 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7605)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on October 20 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-11-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7605)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month. Recognizes that every child in foster care should have a permanent and loving family.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the goals of National Adoption Day and National Adoption Month by promoting national awareness of adoption and the children awaiting families, celebrating children and families involved in adoption, and encouraging the people of the United States to secure safety, permanency, and well-being for all children.
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Landrieu [D-LA] | Sen. Max Baucus [D-MT] | Sen. Mark Begich [D-AK] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] |
Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Jim DeMint [R-SC] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] |
Sen. Chuck Grassley [R-IA] | Sen. Kay Hutchison [R-TX] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] | Sen. Tim Johnson [D-SD] |
Sen. John Kerry [D-MA] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Frank Lautenberg [D-NJ] | Sen. Carl Levin [D-MI] |
Sen. Richard Lugar [R-IN] | Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] | Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] |
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. John Thune [R-SD] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-11-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7605) |
2011-11-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7605-7608) |
2011-10-20 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. (text of measure as introduced: CR S6879) |
Same As/Similar To
HR433 (Related) 2011-10-12 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR595 (Same As) 2012-12-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7638)
HR809 (Related) 2012-11-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR595 (Same As) 2012-12-05 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S7638)
HR809 (Related) 2012-11-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.