US SR267 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-7)
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/25/2017 S5888-5889)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/25/2017 S5888-5889)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating September 2017 as "National Workforce Development Month". Designates September 2017 as National Workforce Development Month. Supports federal initiatives to promote workforce development. Acknowledges that workforce development plays a crucial role in supporting workers and growing the economy.
Title
A resolution designating September 2017 as "National Workforce Development Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Joe Donnelly [D-IN] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA] | Sen. Pat Roberts [R-KS] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] |
Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Lindsey Graham [R-SC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-09-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/25/2017 S5888-5889) |
2017-09-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6234) |
2017-09-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5888-5889; Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S5888-5889) |
Same As/Similar To
SR632 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/18/2018 S6231-6232)
HR1100 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
HR1100 (Related) 2018-09-28 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment
Economic performance and conditions
Employment and training programs
Labor and employment