US SR266 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6143)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on September 14 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-10-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6143)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Supports the goals and ideals of National Save for Retirement Week, including raising public awareness of: (1) tax-preferred retirement vehicles for personal savings and retirement financial security, (2) the availability of a variety of ways to save for retirement favored under the Internal Revenue Code, and (3) saving for retirement and the availability of tax-preferred employer-sponsored retirement savings vehicles.
Title
A resolution supporting the goals and ideals of "National Save for Retirement Week", including raising public awareness of the various tax-preferred retirement vehicles and increasing personal financial literacy.
Sponsors
Sen. Kent Conrad [D-ND] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-10-04 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S6143) |
2011-10-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on Finance discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6143) |
2011-09-14 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5628) |
Same As/Similar To
SR555 (Related) 2012-09-22 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 9/21/2012 S6679)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Employee benefits and pensions
Finance and financial sector
Financial literacy
Financial services and investments
Employee benefits and pensions
Finance and financial sector
Financial literacy
Financial services and investments