US SR26 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 20-1)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S456; text as passed Senate: CR S455)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-01-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S456; text as passed Senate: CR S455)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution designating the week of January 22 through January 28, 2017, as "National School Choice Week". Designates the week of January 22-January 28, 2017, as National School Choice Week. Encourages all parents to learn more about the educational options available.
Title
A resolution designating the week of January 22 through January 28, 2017, as "National School Choice Week".
Sponsors
Sen. Tim Scott [R-SC] | Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] |
Sen. John McCain [R-AZ] | Sen. Thom Tillis [R-NC] | Sen. Orrin Hatch [R-UT] | Sen. David Perdue [R-GA] |
Sen. Roger Wicker [R-MS] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI] | Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Todd Young [R-IN] |
Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Michael Enzi [R-WY] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] | Sen. James Lankford [R-OK] |
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-01-24 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S456; text as passed Senate: CR S455) |
Same As/Similar To
HR703 (Related) 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
SR381 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524)
SR381 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
Congressional tributes
Education
Elementary and secondary education
School administration
Teaching, teachers, curricula
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/26/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres26/BILLS-115sres26ats.pdf |