US HR703 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 18 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-01-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Pending: House Education And The Workforce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the week of January 21 through January 27, 2018, as "National School Choice Week". Expresses support for the designation of as National School Choice Week, and encourages all parents to learn more about the educational options available.
Title
Designating the week of January 21 through January 27, 2018, as "National School Choice Week".
Sponsors
Rep. Andy Biggs [R-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-01-18 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce. |
2018-01-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SR26 (Related) 2017-01-24 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S456; text as passed Senate: CR S455)
SR381 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524)
SR381 (Related) 2018-01-25 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S526; text: CR S524)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-resolution/703/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hres703/BILLS-115hres703ih.pdf |