US SR248 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 05/27/2021 S3902-3903)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 27 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-16 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 05/27/2021 S3902-3903)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing and celebrating the 225th anniversary of the entry of the State of Tennessee into the United States as the 16th State.
Title
A resolution recognizing and celebrating the 225th anniversary of the entry of the State of Tennessee into the United States as the 16th State.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Hagerty [R-TN] | Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-16 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 05/27/2021 S3902-3903) |
2021-06-16 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S4597) |
2021-05-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR453 (Same As) 2021-06-01 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Reform.