US SR219 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on June 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5392-5393)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-09-07 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5392-5393)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Designates September 13, 2011, as National Celiac Disease Awareness Day.
Title
A resolution designating September 13, 2011, as "National Celiac Disease Awareness Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Nelson [D-NE] | Sen. James Inhofe [R-OK] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-09-07 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR S5392-5393) |
2011-09-07 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5392-5393) |
2011-06-29 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S4236) |
Same As/Similar To
SR550 (Related) 2012-09-11 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6238-6239; text as passed Senate: CR S6238-6239; text of measure as introduced: CR S6110)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care
Digestive and metabolic diseases
Health
Health promotion and preventive care