US SR212 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution celebrates the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution, providing for women's suffrage. The resolution also reaffirms the desire of Congress to continue strengthening democratic participation.
Title
A resolution celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-04 - Senate - Resolution RC# 132 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-04 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928) |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Senate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3200) |
2019-05-16 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. |
Same As/Similar To
HR354 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
Subjects
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
U.S. history
Voting rights
Women's rights
Commemorative events and holidays
Congressional tributes
Constitution and constitutional amendments
Sex, gender, sexual orientation discrimination
U.S. history
Voting rights
Women's rights