US SR212 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on May 16 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-06-04 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

A resolution celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States. This resolution celebrates the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the Nineteenth Amendment to the Constitution, providing for women's suffrage. The resolution also reaffirms the desire of Congress to continue strengthening democratic participation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A resolution celebrating the 100th anniversary of the passage and ratification of the 19th Amendment, providing for women's suffrage, to the Constitution of the United States.

Sponsors

Sen. Lisa Murkowski [R-AK]Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI]Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA]Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME]
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH]Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV]Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN]Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA]
Sen. Joni Ernst [R-IA]Sen. Deb Fischer [R-NE]Sen. Cindy Hyde-Smith [R-MS]Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI]
Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA]Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA]Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN]Sen. Kamala Harris [D-CA]
Sen. Martha McSally [R-AZ]Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI]Sen. Jacky Rosen [D-NV]Sen. Catherine Cortez Masto [D-NV]
Sen. Tina Smith [D-MN]Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY]Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH]Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL]
Sen. Krysten Sinema [D-AZ]Sen. Mike Braun [R-IN]Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS]Sen. Roy Blunt [R-MO]
Sen. Dan Sullivan [R-AK]Sen. James Lankford [R-OK]Sen. Mike Lee [R-UT]Sen. John Barrasso [R-WY]
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID]Sen. Steve Daines [R-MT]Sen. Richard Shelby [R-AL]Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT]
Sen. John Boozman [R-AR]Sen. Tom Cotton [R-AR]Sen. John Thune [R-SD]Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA]
Sen. Pat Toomey [R-PA]Sen. John Cornyn [R-TX]Sen. Ron Johnson [R-WI]Sen. John Hoeven [R-ND]
Sen. Mike Rounds [R-SD]Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX]Sen. Johnny Isakson [R-GA]Sen. David Perdue [R-GA]
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL]Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO]Sen. Lamar Alexander [R-TN]Sen. Rick Scott [R-FL]
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA]Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY]Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL]Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA]
Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT]Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR]Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT]Sen. Cory Booker [D-NJ]
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL]Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI]Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH]Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE]
Sen. Bernard Sanders [I-VT]Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE]Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ]Sen. Martin Heinrich [D-NM]
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD]Sen. Jon Tester [D-MT]Sen. Michael Bennet [D-CO]Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI]
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA]Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI]Sen. Mark Warner [D-VA]Sen. Tom Udall [D-NM]
Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT]Sen. Jeff Merkley [D-OR]Sen. Angus King [I-ME]Sen. Brian Schatz [D-HI]
Sen. Joe Manchin [D-WV]Sen. Chris Van Hollen [D-MD]Sen. Kevin Cramer [R-ND]Sen. Todd Young [R-IN]
Sen. Ben Sasse [R-NE]

Roll Calls

2019-06-04 - Senate - Resolution RC# 132 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-04SenateResolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Yea-Nay Vote. 93 - 0. Record Vote Number: 132. (text: CR 5/16/2019 S2928)
2019-06-04SenateSenate Committee on the Judiciary discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3200)
2019-05-16SenateReferred to the Committee on the Judiciary.

Same As/Similar To

HR354 (Related) 2019-05-21 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback