US SR205 | 2013-2014 | 113th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 12-6)
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on July 30 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-07-30 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Expresses support for the goals and ideals of National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of September 2013 as National Ovarian Cancer Awareness Month.
Sponsors
Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Kelly Ayotte [R-NH] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. John Boozman [R-AR] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Kay Hagan [D-NC] | Sen. Mazie Hirono [D-HI] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Jerry Moran [R-KS] |
Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Mark Udall [D-CO] | Sen. David Vitter [R-LA] |
Sen. Elizabeth Warren [D-MA] | Sen. Sheldon Whitehouse [D-RI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-07-30 | Senate | Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S6082; text as passed Senate: CR S6079-6080) |
Same As/Similar To
HR301 (Related) 2013-07-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
HR697 (Related) 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR536 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
HR697 (Related) 2014-07-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Oversight and Government Reform.
SR536 (Related) 2014-08-01 - Submitted in the Senate, considered, and agreed to without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5330; text as passed Senate: CR S5326)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/113th-congress/senate-resolution/205/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/113/bills/sres205/BILLS-113sres205ats.pdf |