US SR204 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 21-1-1)
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5090)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 18 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-07-14 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5090)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution recognizing June 20, 2015 as "World Refugee Day". Reaffirms the bipartisan commitment of the United States to promote the safety, health, and well-being of the millions of refugees and displaced persons who flee war, persecution, and torture. Calls upon the U.S. government to: (1) continue its international leadership role in response to those who have been displaced, including the most vulnerable populations who endure sexual violence, human trafficking, forced conscription, and genocide; and (2) find political solutions to existing conflicts and prevent new conflicts from beginning. Commends those who have risked their lives working individually and for nongovernmental organizations and international agencies that have provided assistance and protection for persons displaced by conflict.
Title
A resolution recognizing June 20, 2015 as "World Refugee Day".
Sponsors
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Patrick Leahy [D-VT] | Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] |
Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Debbie Stabenow [D-MI] | Sen. Patty Murray [D-WA] |
Sen. Barbara Boxer [D-CA] | Sen. Angus King [I-ME] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] | Sen. Jack Reed [D-RI] |
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Ron Wyden [D-OR] | Sen. Amy Klobuchar [D-MN] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] |
Sen. Robert Casey [D-PA] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-07-14 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5090) |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 134. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment and with a preamble. Without written report. |
2015-06-25 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2015-06-18 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4303-4304; text of measure as introduced: CR S4302-4303) |
Subjects
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity
Congressional tributes
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Foreign aid and international relief
Human rights
Human trafficking
International affairs
Refugees, asylum, displaced persons
War crimes, genocide, crimes against humanity