US SR184 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-5)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3296-3297; text: CR S3296-3297)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-06-10 - Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3296-3297; text: CR S3296-3297)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns the terrorist attacks in Sri Lanka by Islamist extremists against innocent civilians on Easter Sunday. It also offers condolences to the victims and their families and friends. It notes the importance of national unity in light of the 10th anniversary of the end of Sri Lanka's civil war.
Title
A resolution condemning the Easter Sunday terrorist attacks in Sri Lanka, offering sincere condolences to the victims, to their families and friends, and to the people and nation of Sri Lanka, and expressing solidarity and support for Sri Lanka.
Sponsors
Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. Mitt Romney [R-UT] | Sen. Christopher Murphy [D-CT] |
Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Maria Cantwell [D-WA] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Jeanne Shaheen [D-NH] | Sen. Marco Rubio [R-FL] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] |
Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Ted Cruz [R-TX] | Sen. Kirsten Gillibrand [D-NY] | Sen. Sherrod Brown [D-OH] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate with an amendment and an amended preamble by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3296-3297; text: CR S3296-3297) |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 105. |
2019-06-03 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Risch with an amendment and with an amended preamble. Without written report. |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported with amendments favorably. |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. (text: CR S2620) |
Subjects
Asia
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sri Lanka
Terrorism
Commemorative events and holidays
Conflicts and wars
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Human rights
International affairs
International organizations and cooperation
Political movements and philosophies
Religion
Sovereignty, recognition, national governance and status
Sri Lanka
Terrorism