US SR179 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 10-0)
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3223)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 25 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-25 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3223)
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 2, 2017, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2017 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month". Expresses support for the designation of June 2017 as National Gun Violence Awareness Month and June 2, 2017, as National Gun Violence Awareness Day. Calls on the people of the United States to: promote greater awareness of gun violence and gun safety; wear orange on National Gun Violence Awareness Day; concentrate heightened attention on gun violence during the summer months, when gun violence typically increases; and bring citizens and community leaders together to discuss ways to make the communities safer.
Title
A resolution expressing support for the designation of June 2, 2017, as "National Gun Violence Awareness Day" and June 2017 as "National Gun Violence Awareness Month".
Sponsors
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Tammy Duckworth [D-IL] | Sen. Dianne Feinstein [D-CA] | Sen. Al Franken [D-MN] |
Sen. Christopher Coons [D-DE] | Sen. Richard Blumenthal [D-CT] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Thomas Carper [D-DE] |
Sen. Tim Kaine [D-VA] | Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S3223) |
Same As/Similar To
HR361 (Related) 2017-06-07 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
HR913 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SR524 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2937-2938)
HR913 (Related) 2018-06-05 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, Homeland Security, and Investigations.
SR524 (Related) 2018-05-24 - Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary. (text of measure as introduced: CR S2937-2938)
Subjects
Commemorative events and holidays
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
Community life and organization
Crime and law enforcement
Crime victims
Firearms and explosives
Violent crime
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/senate-resolution/179/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/sres179/BILLS-115sres179is.pdf |