US SR124 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 3/27/2019 S2055-2056)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 27 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-28 - Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 3/27/2019 S2055-2056)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
This resolution condemns the March 15, 2019, terrorist attacks on the Al Noor and Linwood mosques in Christchurch, New Zealand, and expresses condolences to the victims and their families. It also calls on the U.S. government to redouble efforts to combat the spread of white supremacist terrorism.
Title
A resolution condemning the March 15, 2019, terrorist attacks in Christchurch, New Zealand, offering sincere condolences to all of the victims and their families, and expressing and standing in solidarity with the people and Government of New Zealand.
Sponsors
Sen. Robert Menendez [D-NJ] | Sen. James Risch [R-ID] | Sen. Gary Peters [D-MI] | Sen. Cory Gardner [R-CO] |
Sen. Richard Durbin [D-IL] | Sen. Mitch McConnell [R-KY] | Sen. Edward Markey [D-MA] | Sen. Charles Schumer [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-28 | Senate | Resolution agreed to in Senate without amendment and with a preamble by Unanimous Consent. (text: CR 3/27/2019 S2055-2056) |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Senate Committee on Foreign Relations discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S2100) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
Subjects
Congressional tributes
Crime victims
Hate crimes
International affairs
New Zealand
Oceania
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Terrorism
Violent crime
Crime victims
Hate crimes
International affairs
New Zealand
Oceania
Racial and ethnic relations
Religion
Terrorism
Violent crime